Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Luís Coelho da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1859Born
24 Sep 188122.4Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 191455.5AppointedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
21 Mar 191555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
1 Mar 193676.9DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Luís Coelho da Silva
Bishop Manuel Luís Coelho da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBustelo

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 134

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast