Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António Antunes

Deceased

Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1875Born
17 Jul 189822.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Sep 191943.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
12 Sep 191943.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
27 Dec 191944.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
13 Jun 192448.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Coimbra, Portugal
1 Mar 193660.2SucceededBishop of Coimbra, Portugal
20 Jul 194872.6DiedBishop of Coimbra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António Antunes
Bishop António Antunes (born , died ) Bishop of Coimbra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarreira

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast