Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Domingos Maria Rosa Fructuoso, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1867Born
15 Jun 188922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Dec 192053.8AppointedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
27 Dec 192053.8Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
18 Jan 192153.9InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
6 Jul 194982.4DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Manuel Domingos Maria Rosa Fructuoso
Bishop Manuel Domingos Maria Rosa Fructuoso O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRibeira de Santarém
Ordained BishopEstrela, Basilica, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 79
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,911

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast