Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Terry Ronald LaValley

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1956 Born
27 Feb 198831.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
24 Sep 198832.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
23 Feb 201053.9AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
30 Apr 201054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Terry Ronald LaValley
Bishop Terry Ronald LaValley (born ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlattsburgh, NY
Ordained BishopSaint Mary, Cathedral, Ogdensburg, Diocese of Ogdensburg, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ogdensburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,638

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast