Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Ignacio Larrea Holguín

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1927Born
5 Aug 196234.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
17 May 196941.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
17 May 196941.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
15 Jun 196941.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
11 Jun 197547.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
28 Jun 198052.8SucceededBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
5 Aug 198355.9AppointedBishop of Ecuador, Military
5 Aug 198355.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Novi
25 Mar 198860.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
Jul 1989²61.8ResignedBishop of Ecuador, Military
7 Dec 198962.3SucceededArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
7 May 200375.7RetiredArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
27 Aug 200679.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ignacio Larrea Holguín (VIAF: 2520702)
Archbishop Juan Ignacio Larrea Holguín (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires, Argentina
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 184

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast