Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Willybard Kitogho Lagho

Bishop of Malindi, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1958 Born
21 Dec 198527.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mombasa, Kenya
25 Apr 198729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mombasa, Kenya
28 Dec 202062.7AppointedBishop of Malindi, Kenya
19 Mar 202162.9Ordained BishopBishop of Malindi, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Willybard Kitogho Lagho
Bishop Willybard Kitogho Lagho (born ) Bishop of Malindi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaita-Taveta, Diocese of Mombasa
Ordained BishopSt. Anthony, Cathedral, Malindi, Diocese of Malindi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Malindi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2020
  • od: CB, 28 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 5 Jan 2021
  • mn/ob.loc: CB, 6 Mar 2021
  • c2: CB, 11 Mar 2021
  • fn/c34: CB, 12 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast