Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Marie Philippe Louis Lafont

Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1945 Born
2 Aug 197024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tours, France
18 Jun 200458.6AppointedBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
29 Aug 200458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles
26 Oct 202075.0RetiredBishop of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Marie Philippe Louis Lafont (VIAF: 4553748)
Bishop Emmanuel Marie Philippe Louis Lafont (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cayenne (Cajenna)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint Sauveur, Cathedral, Cayenne, Diocese of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cayenne (Cajenna).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,678
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast