Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Paul Labrie

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Urci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1922Born
20 May 195128.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
4 Apr 197754.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
4 Apr 197754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Urci
14 May 197754.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Urci
19 May 199572.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
29 Jul 200178.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul Labrie
Bishop Jean-Paul Labrie (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaurierville
Ordained BishopSports Pavillion, University, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 95, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast