Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Piotr Kryk

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Castra Martis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1945 Born
27 Jun 197126.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Aug 197126.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 199145.7IncardinatedPriest of Przemyśl (Ukrainian), Poland
24 May 199651.0IncardinatedPriest of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
20 Nov 200055.5AppointedApostolic Exarch of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)
20 Nov 200055.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Martis
3 Feb 200155.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Martis
18 Feb 202175.8RetiredApostolic Exarch of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Piotr Kryk
Bishop Piotr Kryk (born ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKobylnica Woloska, Poland
Ordained BishopMaria Schutz-St Andreas, Cathedral, München, Apostolic Exarchate of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Apostolic Exarchate of Deutschland und Skandinavien {Germany and Scandinavia} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,898
  • inca: CB, 23 Jan 2015
  • od: CB, 23 Oct 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Feb 2021

Quantcast