Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael (Michel) Hrynchyshyn, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Ukrainian)

Titular Bishop of Zygris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1929Born
28 Jul 194617.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 May 195223.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Nov 198253.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
27 Nov 198253.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zygris
30 Jan 198353.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zygris
29 Sep 198758.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
24 Jun 198960.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Great Britain (Ukrainian)
21 Jul 201283.4RetiredApostolic Exarch of France (Ukrainian)
12 Nov 201283.7DiedApostolic Exarch Emeritus of France (Ukrainian)

MicroData Summary for Michael (Michel) Hrynchyshyn (VIAF: 75330917)
Bishop Michael (Michel) Hrynchyshyn C.SS.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Exarch Emeritus of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuchanan, SK, Archdiocese of Regina, Saskatchewan, Canada
Ordained PriestDormition of the Mother of God, Church, Mississauga, ON
Ordained BishopSanta Sofia, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceBishop's House, Vincennes, Val-de-Marne, Eparchy of Saint Vladimir-Le-Grand de Paris (Ukrainian)
Buried Place (Original)Holy Family, Cemetery, Winnipeg, MB, Archeparchy of Winnipeg (Ukrainian), Manitoba, Canada

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 14 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,430
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 87, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jun 2021

Quantcast