Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wayne Joseph Kirkpatrick

Bishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1957 Born
1 Sep 198427.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
18 May 201254.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
18 May 201254.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
25 Jul 201255.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi
18 Dec 201962.5AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
3 Feb 202062.6InstalledBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Wayne Joseph Kirkpatrick
Bishop Wayne Joseph Kirkpatrick (born ) Bishop of Antigonish

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Catharines, Diocese of Saint Catharines, Ontario
Ordained BishopSaint Catherine of Alexandria, Cathedral, St. Catharines, Diocese of Saint Catharines, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Antigonish.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 May 2012
  • ob: CB, 23 Jun 2012
  • c2+: CB, 25 Jun 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,508
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Dec 2019
  • i: CB, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast