Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Aloysius O’Mara

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1924 Born
1 Jun 195126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Toronto, Ontario, Canada
24 May 197651.5AppointedBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada
29 Jun 197651.6Ordained BishopBishop of Thunder Bay, Ontario, Canada
2 Feb 199469.2AppointedBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
13 Apr 199469.4InstalledBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada
9 Nov 200176.9RetiredBishop of Saint Catharines, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius O’Mara
Bishop John Aloysius O’Mara (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Catharines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo, NY, Diocese of Buffalo, New York, USA
Ordained BishopSt. Michel, Cathedral, Toronto, Archdiocese of Toronto, Ontario

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Catharines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 37, Number 2,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast