Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Crispin Kimbeni Ki Kanda

Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

Titular Bishop of Dragonara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1969 Born
30 May 199929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202050.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 Jun 202050.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragonara
10 Oct 202050.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragonara

MicroData Summary for Jean-Crispin Kimbeni Ki Kanda
Bishop Jean-Crispin Kimbeni Ki Kanda (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kinshasa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Ordained BishopGrounds of, l'Institut Technique de la Gombe, Kinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kinshasa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 16 Aug 2020
  • c3: CB, 10 Oct 2020
  • c4: CB, 11 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Nov 2020

Quantcast