Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Louis Kaffer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Dusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1927Born
1 May 195426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Joliet in Illinois, USA
25 Apr 198557.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
25 Apr 198557.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dusa
26 Jun 198557.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dusa
15 Aug 200275.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
28 May 200981.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Roger Louis Kaffer
Bishop Roger Louis Kaffer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJoliet, IL, Diocese of Joliet in Illinois
Ordained BishopS. Raymond Nonnat, Cathedral, Joliet, Diocese of Joliet in Illinois

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 92, Number 7,836

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast