Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
7 Sep 1958 | Born | ||
18 Dec 1983 | 25.2 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Monrovia, Liberia |
1 Oct 2021 | 63.0 | Appointed | Administrator of Monrovia, Liberia |
28 Feb 2024 | 65.4 | Appointed | Archbishop of Monrovia, Liberia |
4 May 2024 | 65.6 | Ordained Bishop | Archbishop of Monrovia, Liberia |
(WikiData: Q124684588)
Father
Gabriel Blamo Snosio
Jubwe
(born )
Archbishop-Elect
of Monrovia
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Lagos, Archdiocese of Lagos, Nigeria |
Ordained Bishop | Sacred Heart, Cathedral, Monrovia, Archdiocese of Monrovia |
Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Monrovia.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 8 Mar 2024 |
✠