Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Demetrio Jiménez Sánchez-Mariscal, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prelate of Cafayate, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1963Born
6 Sep 198117.9ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
11 Oct 198623.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
23 Jun 198824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
10 Feb 201450.3AppointedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
10 May 201450.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina
23 Oct 201956.0DiedPrelate of Cafayate, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Demetrio Jiménez Sánchez-Mariscal
Bishop José Demetrio Jiménez Sánchez-Mariscal O.S.A. (born , died ) Prelate of Cafayate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLos Cerralbos, Spain
Ordained BishopGrounds of, La Serenata, Cafayate, Territorial Prelature of Cafayate
Death PlaceProvincial house, Order of St. Augustine, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 10 Feb 2014
  • c2+: CB, 8 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,154
  • d: CB, 23 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast