Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal Höffner

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea della Valle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1906Born
30 Oct 193225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
9 Jul 196255.5AppointedBishop of Münster, Germany
14 Sep 196255.7Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
6 Jan 196962.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
6 Jan 196962.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquileia
24 Feb 196962.1SucceededArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Apr 196962.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196962.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea della Valle
14 Sep 198780.7RetiredArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
16 Oct 198780.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Höffner
Joseph Cardinal Höffner (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorhausen, Diocese of Trier
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 142
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 389, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast