Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Manuel Hernández Rivera

Bishop Emeritus of Caguas, Puerto Rico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1938 Born
8 Jun 196829.8Ordained PriestPriest of Arecibo, Puerto Rico
11 Jun 197940.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Puerto Rico
11 Jun 197940.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vamalla
17 Aug 197941.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vamalla
13 Feb 198142.5AppointedBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
8 Mar 198142.5InstalledBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico
28 Jul 199859.9ResignedBishop of Caguas, Puerto Rico

MicroData Summary for Enrique Manuel Hernández Rivera
Bishop Enrique Manuel Hernández Rivera (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caguas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamuy
Ordained BishopStade Roberto Clemente, San Juan, Archdiocese of San Juan de Puerto Rico

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caguas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,257

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast