Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Dixon

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1806Born
182922.9Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 185246.6AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
21 Nov 185246.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
29 Apr 186660.2DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph Dixon (VIAF: 21730100)
Archbishop Joseph Dixon (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoalisland
Ordained BishopMaynooth, Archdiocese of Dublin

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 46
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 309, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 732, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,094, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast