Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Francis Cardinal D’Alton

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1882Born
18 Apr 190825.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 194259.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Meath, Ireland
25 Apr 194259.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Binda
29 Jun 194259.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Binda
16 Jun 194360.6SucceededBishop of Meath, Ireland
13 Apr 194663.5AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
12 Jan 195370.2Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jan 195370.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
1 Feb 196380.3DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Francis D’Alton (VIAF: 51600039)
John Francis Cardinal D’Alton (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceClaremorris, Archdiocese of Tuam
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Cathedral Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick's College, Church, Maynooth
Death PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Buried Place (Original)St. Patrick's, Cathedral, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1942, Number 30
  • ab/arch/arma: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1963, Page 52*
  • ab/arch/arma: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 38, Page 209
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 415, Ascendance
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jan 1953
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,094, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast