Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph Cardinal MacRory

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1861Born
13 Sep 188524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Armagh, Ireland
9 Aug 191554.3AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
14 Nov 191554.6Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
22 Jun 192867.2AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
16 Dec 192968.7Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 192968.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
13 Oct 194584.5DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Joseph MacRory (VIAF: 11947300)
Joseph Cardinal MacRory (born , died ) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallygawley, Archdiocese of Armagh
Ordained PriestMaynooth
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Church, Belfast
Death PlaceArmagh, Archdiocese of Armagh
Buried Place (Original)Primates' Plot, St. Patrick's, Cemetery, Armagh, Archdiocese of Armagh

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
  • a cardinal for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1915, Number 73
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 162
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1929
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 415, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 732, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,094, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast