Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Carlo Cardinal Boschi

Deceased

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1715³Born
5 Mar 174630.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 176045.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
5 Oct 176045.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
21 Jul 176651.2Elevated to Cardinal
6 Aug 176651.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
1 Sep 176752.3AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
Jan 1774³58.7AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Regular Discipline
20 Sep 178469.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
Nov 1787³72.5ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Regular Discipline
6 Sep 178873.4DiedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Boschi (VIAF: 15076404)
Giovanni Carlo Cardinal Boschi (born , died ) Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza, Italy

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
  • a cardinal for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 29
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Jul 1766
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 309, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 395, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 407, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 475, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 590, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 732, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,108, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast