Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis James Harrison

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1912Born
4 Jun 193724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 Mar 197158.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 Mar 197158.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Numidia
22 Apr 197158.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Numidia
9 Nov 197664.2AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
6 Feb 197764.4InstalledBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
16 Jun 198774.8RetiredBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
1 May 200491.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis James Harrison
Bishop Francis James Harrison (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSyracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Buried Place (Original)St. Agnes, Cemetery, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CB, 31 Aug 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast