Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Costello

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Perdices


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1929Born
5 Jun 195425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Syracuse, New York, USA
2 Jan 197848.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
2 Jan 197848.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Perdices
13 Mar 197849.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Perdices
23 Mar 200475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
15 Feb 201989.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Costello (VIAF: 73438730)
Bishop Thomas Joseph Costello (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Syracuse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamden, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Death PlaceFrancis House, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Immaculate Conception, Cathedral, Syracuse, Diocese of Syracuse, New York

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 15 Feb 2019
  • loc: CB, 31 Aug 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast