Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvio Guterres Dutra

Bishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1966 Born
18 Dec 199327.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
9 May 201851.9AppointedBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
22 Jul 201852.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Aug 201852.1InstalledBishop of Vacaria, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Silvio Guterres Dutra
Bishop Silvio Guterres Dutra (born ) Bishop of Vacaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEncruzilhada do Sul, Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopGinásio dos Metalúrgicos, Charqueadas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vacaria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 May 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 12 May 2018
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jun 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 237, Number 19,823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast