Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Grua

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1946 Born
1 Nov 197024.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
3 Jul 197125.0Ordained PriestPriest of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron), France
31 Mar 200659.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Jun 200660.0Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
11 Jun 202174.9RetiredBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Bruno Grua (VIAF: 159850342)
Bishop Bruno Grua (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)
Ordained DeaconSainte-Victoire, Church, Volx, Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)
Ordained PriestSaint-Sauveur, Church, Manosque, Diocese of Digne (-Riez-Sisteron)
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Saint-Flour, Diocese of Saint-Flour

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Flour.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,169
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • od/c01: AJ, 29 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Sep 2021

Quantcast