Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didier Fernand Gabriel Noblot

Bishop of Saint-Flour, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1965 Born
30 Jun 199125.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Troyes, France
17 May 199226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Troyes, France
11 Jun 202155.7AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
12 Sep 202155.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France

MicroData Summary for Didier Fernand Gabriel Noblot
Bishop Didier Fernand Gabriel Noblot (born ) Bishop of Saint-Flour

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBar-sur-Aube, Diocese of Troyes
Ordained DeaconSaint-Étienne, Church, Bar-sur-Seine, Diocese of Troyes
Ordained PriestSaint-Pierre, Church, Bar-sur-Aube, Diocese of Troyes
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Saint-Flour, Diocese of Saint-Flour

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint-Flour.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 11 Jun 2021
  • mn: AJ, 28 Jun 2021
  • od/c01: AJ, 29 Jul 2021
  • c2: CB, 4 Sep 2021
  • c34: CB, 7 Sep 2021
  • c4: CB, 12 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Sep 2021

Quantcast