Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Visuvasam Selvaraj

Bishop-Elect of Port Blair, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1966 Born
8 May 199428.3Ordained PriestPriest of Port Blair, India
2020²53.9AppointedAdministrator of Port Blair, India
29 Jun 202155.4AppointedBishop of Port Blair, India
21 Aug 202155.6Ordained BishopBishop of Port Blair, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Visuvasam Selvaraj
Father Visuvasam Selvaraj (born ) Bishop-Elect of Port Blair

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRaja Annamalaipuram, Archdiocese of Madras and Mylapore (Meliapor)

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Port Blair.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jun 2021
  • ob: CB, 31 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast