Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvano Herminio Pedroso Montalvo

Bishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1953 Born
9 Jan 199541.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Cuba
12 Jun 199542.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Cuba
29 Mar 201864.9AppointedBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba
27 May 201865.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba
9 Jun 201865.1InstalledBishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Silvano Herminio Pedroso Montalvo
Bishop Silvano Herminio Pedroso Montalvo (born ) Bishop of Guantánamo-Baracoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCárdenas, Diocese of Matanzas
Ordained PriestCathedral, Havana, Archdiocese of San Cristobal de la Habana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guantánamo-Baracoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2018
  • od/c1: CB, 2 Apr 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 15 Apr 2018
  • c23: CB, 27 May 2018
  • c4: CB, 28 May 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,783

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast