Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Andrew Nkea Fuanya

Archbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1965 Born
22 Apr 199226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buéa, Cameroon
10 Jul 201347.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mamfe, Cameroon
23 Aug 201347.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mamfe, Cameroon
25 Jan 201448.4SucceededBishop of Mamfe, Cameroon
30 Dec 201954.3AppointedArchbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon
22 Feb 202054.4InstalledArchbishop of Bamenda, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Andrew Nkea Fuanya
Archbishop Andrew Nkea Fuanya (born ) Archbishop of Bamenda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWidikum
Ordained BishopMamfe Grandstand, Mamfe, Diocese of Mamfe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bamenda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,852
  • s: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2019
  • i: AM, 29 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast