Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne Fourcadier, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1867Born
26 Aug 190033.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
15 Feb 192860.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tananarive, Madagascar
18 Feb 192860.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
31 May 192861.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
22 Apr 194779.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Tananarive, Madagascar
2 May 194881.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Etienne Fourcadier
Bishop Etienne Fourcadier S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tananarive

EventPlace
Birth PlaceViala-du-Tarn, France

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1928, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast