Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georgios Altouvas

Archbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece

Apostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1973 Born
5 Oct 199724.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
3 Oct 199825.0Ordained PriestPriest of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
14 Sep 202046.9AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
14 Sep 202046.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Thessaloniki, Greece
7 Feb 202147.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece
14 Feb 202147.3InstalledArchbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia, Greece

MicroData Summary for Georgios Altouvas
Archbishop Georgios Altouvas (born ) Archbishop of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthēnai, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}
Ordained DeaconSaint Luke, Church, Heraklion, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}
Ordained PriestSt. Dionysius, Cathedral, Athēnai, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}
Ordained BishopSt. Dionysius, Cathedral, Athēnai, Archdiocese of Athēnai {Athens}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Corf¨, Zante e Cefalonia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Sep 2020
  • od/c01: CB, 11 Nov 2020
  • i: CB, 1 Feb 2021
  • ob: CB, 30 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 7 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Feb 2021

Quantcast