Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paulo Renato Fernandes Gonçalves de Campos

Bishop-Elect of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1973 Born
20 Mar 200431.1Ordained PriestPriest of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
18 Oct 202350.7AppointedBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
16 Dec 202350.9Ordained BishopBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil
28 Jan 202451.0InstalledBishop of Barra do Garças, Mato Grosso, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Renato Fernandes Gonçalves de Campos
Father Paulo Renato Fernandes Gonçalves de Campos (born ) Bishop-Elect of Barra do Garças

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo
Ordained BishopCentro Evangelização, Paróquia Coração de Jesus, São José dos Campos, Diocese of São José dos Campos, Sao Paulo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Barra do Garças.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2023
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 28 Oct 2023