Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Kourouma

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of N’Zérékoré, Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1932Born
8 Sep 196229.7Ordained PriestPriest of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
13 Aug 197946.7AppointedBishop of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
15 Dec 197947.0Ordained BishopBishop of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
27 Nov 200774.9RetiredBishop of N’Zérékoré, Guinea
10 Feb 200976.1DiedBishop Emeritus of N’Zérékoré, Guinea

MicroData Summary for Philippe Kourouma
Bishop Philippe Kourouma (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of N’Zérékoré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamoé
Ordained BishopN’Zérékoré, Diocese of N’Zérékoré

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Nov 2007
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,430

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast