Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillus Archibong Etokudoh

Bishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1949 Born
2 Jul 197828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
18 Jan 198838.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
18 Jan 198838.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Capra
14 May 198838.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Capra
1 Sep 198940.0AppointedBishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
4 May 200959.7AppointedBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria
25 Jul 200959.9InstalledBishop of Port Harcourt, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Camillus Archibong Etokudoh
Bishop Camillus Archibong Etokudoh (born ) Bishop of Port Harcourt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIkot Uko Etor
Ordained BishopIkot Ekpene, Diocese of Ikot Ekpene

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Port Harcourt.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,556
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • i: CB, 16 Sep 2017
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2019, Page 548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast