Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dominic Ignatius Cardinal Ekandem

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Abuja, Nigeria

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1917²Born
7 Dec 194730.9Ordained PriestPriest of Calabar, Nigeria
7 Aug 195336.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Calabar, Nigeria
7 Aug 195336.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
7 Feb 195437.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
1 Mar 196346.1AppointedBishop of Ikot Ekpene, Nigeria
24 May 197659.3Elevated to Cardinal
24 May 197659.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
6 Nov 198164.8AppointedSuperior of Abuja, Nigeria
19 Jun 198972.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Abuja, Nigeria
28 Sep 199275.7RetiredBishop of Abuja, Nigeria
24 Nov 199578.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Abuja, Nigeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Dominic Ignatius Ekandem (VIAF: 38380863)
Dominic Ignatius Cardinal Ekandem (born 1917, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Abuja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceObio Ibiono, Prefecture Apostolic of Western Nigeria {Nigeria Occidentale}

  • a priest for 47.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
  • a cardinal for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast