Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Gerardo Escalante Molina

Apostolic Nuncio to Haiti

Titular Archbishop of Gratiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1965 Born
26 Aug 198924.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristóbal de Venezuela
19 Mar 201651.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Republic of
19 Mar 201651.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gratiana
21 May 201651.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gabon
28 May 201651.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Gratiana
4 Jun 202156.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gerardo Escalante Molina (VIAF: 311261331)
Archbishop Francisco Gerardo Escalante Molina (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Haiti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Grita
Ordained BishopSanto Tomás de Aquino, Seminary, Palmira, Diocese of San Cristóbal de Venezuela

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Haiti.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2016
  • ob: CB, 10 Apr 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,923
  • mn: CB, 13 Jan 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jun 2021

Quantcast