Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Pablo Elizondo Cárdenas, L.C.

Bishop of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1949 Born
26 Nov 196819.2First VowsMember of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
Apr 1974³24.5Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
24 Dec 198233.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Legionaries of Christ
26 Oct 200455.1AppointedPrelate of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México
22 Nov 200455.2Ordained BishopPrelate of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México
15 Feb 202070.4AppointedBishop of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo, México

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Pablo Elizondo Cárdenas
Bishop Pedro Pablo Elizondo Cárdenas L.C. (born ) Bishop of Cancún-Chetumal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan José de Gracia
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones, Cancún, Territorial Prelature of Cancún-Chetumal, Quintana Roo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cancún-Chetumal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,717
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast