Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Édouard-Auguste Dubar, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1826Born
9 Oct 185225.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
22 Sep 186033.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
9 Sep 186437.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China
9 Sep 186437.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
19 Feb 186538.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
1 Jul 187851.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}, China

MicroData Summary for Édouard-Auguste Dubar (VIAF: 10149980)
Bishop Édouard-Auguste Dubar S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoubaix, Diocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopTchang-kia-tchouang
Death PlaceTchang-kia-tchouang

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 177
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 2
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast