Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albert D’Souza

Archbishop Emeritus of Agra, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1945 Born
8 Dec 197429.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 199247.2AppointedBishop of Lucknow, India
7 Feb 199347.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lucknow, India
16 Feb 200761.5AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
12 Nov 202075.2RetiredArchbishop of Agra, India

MicroData Summary for Albert D’Souza
Archbishop Albert D’Souza (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Agra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoodubelle
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Hazratganj, Diocese of Lucknow

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,109
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast