Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Désiré Delrue

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

Titular Bishop of Polymartium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1928Born
23 Dec 195325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
9 Oct 197951.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
9 Oct 197951.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Polymartium
2 Dec 197951.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polymartium
22 May 198253.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Henri Désiré Delrue
Bishop Henri Désiré Delrue (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLinselle
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,264
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast