Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel Luc Jean-Marie Delmas

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1954 Born
26 Jun 198833.4Ordained PriestPriest of Cahors, France
17 Jun 200853.4AppointedBishop of Angers, France
28 Sep 200853.7Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel Luc Jean-Marie Delmas (VIAF: 224764694)
Bishop Emmanuel Luc Jean-Marie Delmas (born ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFigeac

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Angers.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,965

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast