Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florentin Crihălmeanu

Deceased

Bishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1959Born
8 Sep 199030.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
9 Sep 199030.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
6 Nov 199637.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
6 Nov 199637.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Silli
6 Jan 199737.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silli
18 Jul 200242.8AppointedBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania
12 Jan 202161.3DiedBishop of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian), Romania

MicroData Summary for Florentin Crihălmeanu (VIAF: 59371054)
Bishop Florentin Crihălmeanu (born , died ) Bishop of Cluj-Gherla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIasi, Diocese of Iaşi
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCongregation of the Sisters of the Mother of God, Monastery, Cluj Napoca, Diocese of Cluj-Gherla (Romanian)

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,880
  • od/c01: CB, 13 Apr 2020
  • d: CB, 12 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Jan 2021

Quantcast