Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Marie Jacques Dubost, C.I.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France

Apostolic Administrator of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1942 Born
25 May 196725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
9 Aug 198947.3AppointedOrdinary of France, Military
9 Aug 198947.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Oëa
8 Sep 198947.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oëa
7 Mar 199855.8ResignedTitular Bishop of Oëa
15 Apr 200058.0AppointedBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
12 May 200058.0InstalledBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
1 Aug 201775.2RetiredBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
24 Jun 201977.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lyon, France
20 Dec 202078.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Lyon, France
7 Apr 202178.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cayenne (Cajenna), French Guyana, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Michel Marie Jacques Dubost (VIAF: 101693525)
Bishop Michel Marie Jacques Dubost C.I.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSafi, Morocco
Ordained PriestSaint-Esprit, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,467
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Aug 2017
  • c1/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2019
  • aadm: CB, 9 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Apr 2021

Quantcast