Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Zhou Weidao (Chow Wei-tao), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1905Born
192721.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jan 193024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
31 May 195045.0AppointedBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
1 Oct 195045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
1979¹73.6ResignedBishop of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China
14 Feb 198377.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Fengxiang [Fengsiang], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Zhou Weidao (Chow Wei-tao)
Bishop Anthony Zhou Weidao (Chow Wei-tao) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fengxiang [Fengsiang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTa Ying Li
Ordained BishopShanghai

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,950, Number 78
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,984, Page 1,014
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast