Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pacificus Li Huande (Li Xuande, Ly Hsuan-te), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China

Apostolic Administrator of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1904Born
192722.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
17 May 193026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Dec 195147.7AppointedBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
25 Jan 195247.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Xi’an [Sian, Chang-An], China
10 Feb 195247.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China
16 Feb 197267.9DiedBishop of Yan’an [Yenan], China

MicroData Summary for Pacificus Li Huande (Li Xuande, Ly Hsuan-te)
Bishop Pacificus Li Huande (Li Xuande, Ly Hsuan-te) O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Yan’an [Yenan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTung-yüang-fang
Ordained BishopFenxiang, Diocese of Fengxiang [Fengsiang]

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,689
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,911
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1952, Number 12
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast