Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]

Dioecesis Sciamhaevensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • [ Zhang Tongli], Bishop
  • Thaddeus Ma Daquin, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Joseph Xing Wenzhi, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Nanjing [Nanking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 10,000 (3,862 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.catholicsh.org/
  • Mailing Address: St.-Joseph Church, Szechwan Road South, Shanghai, Jiangsu, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Shanghai [Shanghai]
13 December 1933ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing] Vicariate Apostolic of Shanghai [Shanghai] (erected)
Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Shanghai [Shanghai] Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
9 June 1949Territory LostDiocese of Shanghai [Shanghai] Prefecture Apostolic of Haizhou [Haichow, Donghai, Tunghai] (erected)
Diocese of Suzhou [Soochow] (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Yangzhou [Yangchow] (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Shanghai [Shanghai]
19506,000,000.0%781171950226690ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast