Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Félix Choulet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1854Born
1877¹22.0ProfessedMember of La Société des Missions Etrangères
4 Jul 188025.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
21 Feb 190146.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China
21 Feb 190146.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
24 Nov 190146.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
1 Jul 192065.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China
31 Jul 192368.6DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marie-Félix Choulet
Bishop Marie-Félix Choulet M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Southern Manchuria {Manciuria Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrésy-sur-Aix, Archdiocese of Chambéry, France
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceNewchwang

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 602
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1901, Number 70
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast