Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Florian-Jean-Baptiste Démange, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)

Titular Bishop of Adrasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1875Born
26 Jun 189823.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
8 Apr 191135.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)
8 Apr 191135.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Adrasus
11 Jun 191136.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Adrasus
9 Feb 193862.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Taiku, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary for Florian-Jean-Baptiste Démange
Bishop Florian-Jean-Baptiste Démange M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Taiku

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaulxures-les-Saales, France

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • c3+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 37
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast