Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino José Da Silva

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1749Born
26 Sep 177324.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 178940.4SelectedBishop of Macau, China
14 Dec 178940.8ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
17 Jan 179040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
16 Sep 180253.5ResignedBishop of Macau, China
11 Jun 183081.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Marcelino José Da Silva
Bishop Marcelino José Da Silva (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCernache do Bonjardim, Portugal
Ordained BishopRoyal, Basilica, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 237
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 578
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast